KENTISH TOWN CITY FARM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is an educational/recreational project providing services covering environmental and community education/sports and recreation/play and youth work/elderly and special needs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £101,664 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- KENTISH TOWN CITY FARM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Woods | Chair | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Maria Vaz | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Mairead Regan | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Andrea Shack | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wilcock | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Chadney | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £383.35k | £360.40k | £366.63k | £365.03k | £318.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £354.89k | £304.26k | £318.30k | £336.55k | £331.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £83.00k | £155.47k | £149.34k | £101.00k | £101.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH MAY 1986 AND AMENDED ON 13TH OCTOBER 2004. ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF 24TH NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING OR WORKING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND ELSEWHERE IN LONDON (HEREINAFTER CALLED"THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND/OR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, AND PARTICULARLY OF THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND PARTICULARLY YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS, AND IN PRINCIPALS OF SELF DISCIPLINE AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO THAT THEY DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, AND GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, AND THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. C) TO PROMOTE AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT HUMANITY AND MORALITY BY EDUCATING THEM IN CARE AND CONSIDERATION OF ALL ANIMALS PARTICULARLY ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION, AND FOR THESE PURPOSES TO CARE FOR AND EXHIBIT ANIMALS IN COMMON AGRICULTURAL AND DOMESTIC USE SO THAT THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULARLY THE YOUNG MEMBERS THEREOF, WILL LEARN A GREATER AWARENESS OF APPRECIATION FOR SUCH ANIMALS. D) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, RESIDENT IN THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT, SO AS TO PREPARE THEM FOR ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE, AND THEREBY ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE OR ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVELIHOOD. E) TO RELIEVE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED OR DISABLED OR DEPRIVED INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AS A REMEDIAL RECREATIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC ACTIVITY, FACILITIES FOR HORSE AND PONY RIDING.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND ELSEWHERE IN LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Cressfield Close
London
NW5 4BN
- Phone:
- 02079165421
- Email:
- director@ktcityfarm.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window