Financial history WESTWOOD FARM COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 294802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £137.22k £135.74k £112.41k £118.31k £123.47k
Total expenditure £131.29k £114.12k £113.79k £130.52k £120.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A