Financial history WALSINGHAM SUPPORT

Charity number: 294832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £31.60m £29.18m £28.39m £28.18m £28.71m
Total expenditure £32.40m £31.10m £27.74m £28.98m £28.08m
Income from government contracts N/A £25.12m £25.90m £25.91m £27.07m
Income from government grants N/A £874.00k £848.61k N/A £4.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £58.00k £1.02m £768.00k £219.00k £177.99k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £28.57m £27.98m £27.04m £27.68m £28.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £2.97m £175.00k £157.00k £280.00k £158.76k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £32.40m £31.10m £27.74m £28.98m £28.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £482.00k £151.00k £184.00k £107.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0