THE SURREY CLERGY RELIEF SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the Anglican Clergy and their families in the Archdeaconries of Surrey, Dorking, Reigate, Southwark, Lambeth and Wandsworth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 July 1986: Standard registration
- 21 January 2019: Funds received from 231799 THE CUTHBERT GIFT
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVD CANON MAVIS KIRBY WILSON | Chair | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
The Venerable Catharine Mabuza | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE JONATHAN SEDGWICK | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
The Venerable Martin BREADMORE | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE JOHN KIDDLE | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE MOIRA ANNE ELIZABETH ASTIN | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
HOWARD JOHN DELLAR | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE SIMON GATES | Trustee | 03 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.33k | £3.18k | £1.85k | £2.24k | £3.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.77k | £7.05k | £6.92k | £7.23k | £6.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 August 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 August 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 August 2020 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE CLERGY WHETHER BENEFICED,LICENSED OR RESIDING OR FORMERLY BENEFICED,LICENSED OR RESIDING OR FORMERLY BENEFICED,LICENSED OR RESIDING IN THE ARCHDEACONRIES OF SURREY, DORKING, KINGSTON, WANDSWORTH OR SOUTHWARK AND OF THEIR WIVES, FORMER WIVES AND CHILDREN AND OF THE WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OF SUCH CLERGY DYING WHILST SO BENEFICED,LICENSED AND RESIDING AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS MAY BE DETERMINED FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
LEE BOLTON MONIER WILLIAMS LLP
1 THE SANCTUARY
LONDON
SW1P 3JT
- Phone:
- 01227728436
- Email:
- sarah@neden.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window