The Chasah Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Adult education focused on the role of the arts and business in improving outcomes for the poorer people in society The relief of poverty The charity delivers a learning journey for young adults collaborating with other charities and makes grants to individuals and institutions for the furtherance of education and the relief of poverty in areas where we can work on systemic change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 July 1986: Standard registration
- CHASAH MUSIC (Working name)
- DRIVERS FOR CHANGE (Previous name)
- THE CHASAH TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Collier-Keywood | Chair | 24 September 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Judith Pamela Bird | Trustee | 15 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard David COLLIER-KEYWOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.35k | £4.47k | £15.07k | £11.36k | £12.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.39k | £14.49k | £12.89k | £11.63k | £12.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JUN 1986 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUL 2017 as amended on 09 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION, LOAN, GIFT, SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: (I) THE FURTHERANCE OF CHRISTIAN KNOWLEDGE AND EDUCATION. (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (III) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (IV) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 South Road
REIGATE
Surrey
RH2 7LB
- Phone:
- 07843393510
- Email:
- lck07@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window