11TH BRISTOL (HEADLEY PARK) AIR SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 294904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Working with young people

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £36,910
Total expenditure: £21,178

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN JEFFREY CHALMERS Chair 28 December 2017
YOUTH MOVES
Received: On time
BRISTOL SOUTH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Nadia O'Neill Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Abel Ezimokhai Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Lucy Anne Davies Trustee 11 August 2023
None on record
Daniel Sheehan Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Kayleigh Poulton Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Richard Betteridge Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.46k £20.03k £13.43k £7.23k £36.91k
Total expenditure £4.93k £6.32k £19.43k £13.87k £21.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.62k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Almond Walk Bristol BS13 7BJ
BRISTOL
BS13 7BJ
Phone:
07803455504
Website:

No information available