THE TRAIDCRAFT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Traidcraft Foundation is the founder member of Traidcraft Exchange, and appoints the trustees of Traidcraft Exchange. It also holds the Guardian Share in Traidcraft plc, to enable it to protect the vision and mission of that organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,377,803
Donations and legacies | £1.88m | |
Charitable activities | £1.50m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,922,184
Raising funds | £856.53k | |
Charitable activities | £3.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £238,356 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £856.53k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.07m |
People

71 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 04 April 1995: Standard registration
- 21 August 1995: Removed
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE RT HON SIR STEPHEN TIMMS MP | Chair | 14 September 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Stephen Bonnick | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Clive Osmond | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
ALISON MARGARET COUTTS | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Jeremy Lefroy | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09m | £3.83m | £4.24m | £3.22m | £3.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.38m | £3.34m | £3.54m | £4.35m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.69m | £98.00k | £198.00k | £36.04k | £238.36k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.24m | £2.16m | £2.25m | £1.42m | £1.88m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.69m | £1.67m | £1.99m | £1.80m | £1.50m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £163.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £205.00k | £238.00k | £576.00k | £131.92k | £328.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.70m | £2.38m | £2.79m | £3.41m | £3.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £679.00k | £953.00k | £753.00k | £942.57k | £856.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.00k | £32.00k | £58.00k | £89.77k | £76.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £61.00k | £43.00k | £19.00k | £14.86k | £31.85k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.62m | £2.60m | £3.13m | £1.99m | £934.88k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £751.00k | £1.29m | £1.08m | £1.07m | £411.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST JULY 1986 AS VARIED BY DEED OF AMALGAMATION DATED 3RD SEPTEMBER 1986 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 18TH JANUARY 1988 AND 10 MARCH 1995 AS VARIED BY A DECLARATION OF TRUST DATES 03/12/05 AND ORDER OF 21/11/05
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE AS FOLLOWS:- (1) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THOSE COUNTRIES DEFINED AS DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE 14.3 OF THE DEED DATED 3RD DECEMBER 2002 (THEREIN AND HEREINAFTER CALLED "DEVELOPING COUNTRIES"). (2) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF STUDIES IN THEOLOGICAL, POLITICAL, SOCIAL, TECHNICAL AND ECONOMIC SUBJECTS AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL SUBJECTS (3) THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF EDUCATION AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN THESE SUBJECTS WITH PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE) REFERENCE TO THE PROBLEMS OF ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES ARISING FROM NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL TRADING PRACTICES (4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY COMMENDING THAT RELIGION TO PERSONS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND ELSEWHERE (5) THE PROMOTION OF OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1.5 OF DEED DATED 3 DECEMBER 2002).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 04 April 1995 : Standard registration
- 21 August 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Traidcraft Exchange
Turners Building
7-15 Pink Lane
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 5DW
- Phone:
- 02037525717
- Email:
- stephen_timms@compuserve.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window