PAC-UK LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide high quality, innovative services that support and make a difference to all affected by adoption and permanency: children and families, adults who were adopted/placed as children, birth family members and professionals. Our aim is to relieve distress, strengthen family relationships and inform and improve professional practice in relation to adoption and other permanent placements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 September 1986: Standard registration
- 22 December 2014: Funds received from 1057667 AFTER ADOPTION YORKSHIRE
- PAC (Previous name)
- POST ADOPTION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Raymond Hargrave | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID CHARLES HOLMES | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Family Action | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/07/1986 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/06/2014 as amended on 01 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF, AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO, CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS, WHO ARE PLACED OR TO BE PLACED, OR WHO WERE PLACED, FOR ADOPTION OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OR IN RECEIPT OF, OR RECEIVED, SIMILAR CARE, AND THEIR FAMILIES, CARERS OR THOSE OTHERWISE WITH RESPONSIBILITY, OR PROSPECTIVE RESPONSIBILITY, FOR THEM (THE BENEFICIARIES); TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF THE BENEFICIARIES, AND TO RELIEVE ANY SUFFERING AND DISADVANTAGE EXPERIENCED BY THEM; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS WHO WORK WITH, PROVIDE ADVICE TO OR CONTRIBUTE TO THE SUPPORT OF THE BENEFICIARIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN RELATION TO THE NEEDS OF THE BENEFICIARIES; AND TO FURTHER SUCH ANCILLARY AND INCIDENTAL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Family Action
34 Wharf Road
LONDON
N1 7GR
- Phone:
- 020 7284 0555
- Email:
- info@family-action.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window