Financial history THE HUGH WESTWOOD EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 295012
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.54k £11.08k £21.54k £23.03k £23.95k
Total expenditure £8.06k £10.67k £10.15k £17.48k £23.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A