THE ST JOHN'S CHURCH RESTORATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fund exists to support the maintenance and repair of the fabric of St John's Church, Frome and its surrounds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 21 October 1986: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 September 2011: Re-registered
- THE ST JOHN'S RESTORATION FUND (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence William Bushell | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Margaret Veakins | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL NEIL MCCORMICK | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|||||
LOIS MARY BUSHELL | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|||||
AMANDA ROSEMARY CROOK | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|||||
PETER JOHN CONNEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/01/2020 | 12/01/2021 | 12/01/2022 | 12/01/2023 | 12/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82k | £1.39k | £363 | £404 | £732 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.02k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2022 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2021 | 04 January 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 January 2020 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1986, ORDER OF 05/01/2005 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE FABRIC OF ST JOHN'S CHURCH AND ITS SURROUNDS INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION: (A) THE CARRYING OUT OFESSENTIAL REPAIRS TO THE LEAD ROOF (B) REPAIRS TO THE MASONRY OF THE CHURCH (C) IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHURCH'S INTERNAL AND EXTERNAL LIGHTING (D) THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF THE CHURCHYARD (E) IMPROVEMENTS TO ST JOHN'S COTTAGE (F) ANY OTHER WORK OF MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION, IMPROVEMENT, REBUILDING OR CONSTRUCTIONS WHICH THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DEEM TO BE A NECESSARY EXPENDITURE PROVIDED ONLY THAT SUCH WORKS ARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLE OBJECTS DECLARED ABOVE.
Area of benefit
ST JOHN'S CHURCH AND ITS SURROUNDS, FROME, SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Cottage
Church Steps
FROME
Somerset
BA11 1PL
- Phone:
- 01373462325
- Email:
- administrator@sjfrome.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window