EASTERN ANGLES THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Touring theatre company established in 1982, bringing high-quality productions of new writing to mainly rural towns and villages in the East of England. Also schools tours and workshops, site-specific performances and occasional national tours, including performances in London and at the Edinburgh Festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £289,074 from 13 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Peterborough City
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 October 1986: Standard registration
- 13 May 2024: Funds received from 1174135 ORWELL DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY
- EASTERN ANGLES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Stewart | Chair | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Biscoe | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Edwards | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Harrison Rose | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hooton | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Taylor | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASSIS CARREIRO | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Miller | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Emma Austin | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £659.63k | £480.78k | £851.98k | £606.61k | £486.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £693.66k | £386.83k | £846.32k | £568.39k | £541.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.17k | £427.77k | £142.22k | £76.55k | £289.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £366.06k | N/A | £579.77k | £425.04k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.04k | N/A | £9.83k | £37.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £254.63k | N/A | £208.14k | £87.34k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £313 | N/A | £297 | £1.73k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £15.59k | N/A | £53.95k | £54.66k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £684.15k | N/A | £819.67k | £538.78k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £9.51k | N/A | £26.66k | £29.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.49k | N/A | £33.85k | £21.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/04/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/07/1986 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 JUL 2017 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUL 2017 as amended on 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC, LITERATURE AND POETRY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTERN ANGLES THEATRE CO
SIR JOHN MILLS THEATRE
GATACRE ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 2LQ
- Phone:
- 01473218202
- Email:
- admin@easternangles.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window