ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE HELP AND RESOURCES TO MUSEUM. RAISE FUNDS FOR PROJECTS. GIVE GRANTS TO MUSEUM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
Governance
- 24 October 1986: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE MUSEUM OF KENT RURAL LIFE (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW COLLINS | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE ORMISTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID PHILIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207 | £0 | £0 | £3 | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £758 | £500 | £200 | £274 | £402 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH AUGUST 1986 AS AMENDED ON 29TH MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT, PROJECT AND SAFEGUARD THE INTERESTS, AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE MUSEUM OF KENT LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 MAIDSTONE ROAD
GILLINGHAM
ME8 0DQ
- Phone:
- 01634365789
- Email:
- Friends@deo.me.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window