Trustees CURRY MALLET AND BEERCROCOMBE VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 296165

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Barnes | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Beck | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Barnes | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dale | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Marks | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Louisa Grace Wood | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Maggs | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niki Maggs | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Winton | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jill Winton | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jane Talbot | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dame Frances Saunders | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Plumbly | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mike Bawler | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.