MIDDLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 296687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management and maintenance of the Village Hall for the use of residents and non-residents of the village.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £7,285
Total expenditure: £13,578

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD TURNER Chair
Middleton-cum-Fordley Community Council
Received: On time
Patricia Cooke Trustee 26 May 2021
Middleton-cum-Fordley Community Council
Received: On time
Lynda Whitbread Trustee 17 February 2020
None on record
Mark Andrew Mitchels Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
YVONNE HATCHER Trustee
None on record
BARBARA BARKER Trustee
Middleton-cum-Fordley Community Council
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.25k £22.91k £22.47k £4.16k £7.29k
Total expenditure £7.12k £13.62k £17.92k £10.96k £13.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £19.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 MEADOW VIEW
RECTORY ROAD
MIDDLETON
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 3NR
Phone:
01728 648726
Website:

No information available