HELP COUNSELLING SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OFFERS FREE OR LOW COST COUNSELLING TO ANYONE IN NEED WITHIN WEST WILTSHIRE 16+
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 September 1987: Standard registration
- 15 October 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1174668 HELP COUNSELLING SERVICES CIO
- HCS (Working name)
- THE HELP TROWBRIDGE PROJECT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.18k | £67.13k | £31.91k | £52.10k | £48.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.76k | £45.68k | £42.26k | £44.16k | £44.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £6.00k | £1.00k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 22 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 07 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
07 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/1992 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS LIVING IN THE DISTRICT OF WEST WILTSHIRE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF A CONFIDENTIAL COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
WEST WILTSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window