THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SOUTH PETHERTON HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising by subscriptions and events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 14 October 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew James ELFICK | Chair | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Wendy Robinson | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Louise Shakespeare | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Florence Ward | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Sharon Barlow | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hunt Cooke | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shona McKay Ashdown | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katherine thorne | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Norman Hawkins | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Morrison | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | £10.22k | £10.10k | £5.60k | £9.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.09k | £8.02k | £33.51k | £2.36k | £7.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUNE 1987. as amended on 17 May 2023 as amended on 17 May 2023
Charitable objects
3. The Object of the League shall be to relieve patients and former patients of the Hospital and other invalids in the community who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial assistance and generally to support the charitable work of the said Hospital.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Petherton Hospital
Bernard Way
SOUTH PETHERTON
TA13 5EF
- Phone:
- 01460249119
- Email:
- chair@lofsph.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window