THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOMERSET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Charity is to promote the education of girls and young women to help them develop emotionally, mentally, physically and spiritually so that they can make a positive contribution to their community and the wider world. Somerset County is composed of 10 Divisions. Each of these has numerous units. Weekly guiding activities, camps, crafts and sporting events take place at all levels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
504 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 20 August 1987: Standard registration
- GUIDE ASSOCIATION SOMERSET (Working name)
- SOMERSET GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- SOMERSET COUNTY GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Hatch | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
JANE SINNOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jeanette Barnes | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jenny Coburn | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tamsin Wetherall | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kelly Pope | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Ruth Forbes | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
LINDA CARRINGTON | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Jill Tompkins | Trustee | 10 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Janet Shackleton | Trustee | 19 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
Beverley Osborne | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Sandra Verrier | Trustee | 23 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
CLAIRE EDMONDS | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.71k | £34.04k | £21.95k | £16.10k | £39.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.25k | £13.90k | £11.65k | £12.74k | £18.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14/12/1922
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fieldcroft
Shepherds Hill
Buckhorn Weston
GILLINGHAM
Dorset
SP8 5HX
- Phone:
- 07789884984
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window