Financial history E D P DRUG & ALCOHOL SERVICES

Charity Number: 297370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 01/07/2023 01/07/2024
Total gross income £9.62m £10.08m £9.86m £2.23m £0
Total expenditure £9.05m £9.51m £9.39m £4.87m £0
Income from government contracts £6.93m £7.34m £9.85m £2.22m N/A
Income from government grants £11.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.94k £5.14k £6.62k £698 N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £9.61m £10.08m £9.85m £2.22m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £182 £80 £13.12k £11.85k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.05m £9.51m £9.39m £2.14m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £216 £216 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £33.65k £15.76k £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.73m N/A