E D P DRUG & ALCOHOL SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDP's mission is to open doors for people affected by substance misuse so they can improve their lives and those of their families and communities. It is EDP's vision to improve the quality of life for people affected by substance misuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Dorset
Governance
- 21 August 1987: Standard registration
- EDP DRUG & ALCOHOL SERVICES (Working name)
- EXETER DRUGS PROJECT (Previous name)
- EXETER DRUGS PROJECT LTD (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MACQUEEN | Chair | 21 July 2011 |
|
|||||
SARAH SHEPHERD | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Carl Andrew Grindrod | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Gilbert | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 01/07/2023 | 01/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.62m | £10.08m | £9.86m | £2.23m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.05m | £9.51m | £9.39m | £4.87m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.93m | £7.34m | £9.85m | £2.22m | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.94k | £5.14k | £6.62k | £698 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.61m | £10.08m | £9.85m | £2.22m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £182 | £80 | £13.12k | £11.85k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.05m | £9.51m | £9.39m | £2.14m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £216 | £216 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £33.65k | £15.76k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.73m | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2024 | 14 May 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 JUL 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 DEC 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 OCT 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 APR 2020
Charitable objects
5.1 THE OBJECTS (OBJECTS) FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ORDER TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS WHO MAY BE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND SEEKING TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, TO BECOME FULLY INTEGRATED MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: 5.1.1 PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN THE RELIEF OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED BY REASONS OF SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY, INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; 5.1.2 RELIEVING THE HARDSHIP OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASONS OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING AND HOUSING SUPPORT; 5.1.3 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (INCLUDING SUSTAINABLE TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT OR WORK) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED DUE TO THE LACK OF EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT OR WHO OTHERWISE REQUIRE ASSISTANCE IN GAINING EMPLOYMENT; 5.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP (FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE) AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE, FAMILIES AND OTHER MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES, ADVICE AND SUPPORT AS MAY BE REQUIRED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 5.1.5 ASSISTING IN THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, AND IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CLINICAL AND OTHER SERVICES AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Human Kind
Unit 22
Bowburn North Industrial Estate
Bowburn
DURHAM
DH6 5PF
- Phone:
- 01392 710666
- Email:
- info@edp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window