REIGATE AND REDHILL U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
U3A provides Public Benefit by facilitating continuing education and social welfare to older people no longer in full-time employment. This is achieved by forming small, interactive groups of people with common or related interests who meet in each others homes, by organising general, monthly meetings with expert presenters on a wide range of subjects and by running trips to places of interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
138 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 August 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Ruth Haimes | Chair | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Roberta Valkenaar-Woolley | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY COCKETT | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith David Vickers | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ernest Lloyd | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Valerie Frances Busby | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hugh deMowbray Winter | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary Earl | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clare Stoddart | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Susan Austin | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Chapman | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John White Winter Cousins | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Livesey | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Hilary Ann Viner-Loney | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.75k | £6.35k | £22.26k | £40.71k | £36.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.64k | £9.66k | £22.16k | £44.20k | £35.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29TH JANUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 4TH MAY 1989 AND 4TH JANUARY 1991, AS AMENDED ON 4TH OCTOBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018 as amended on 02 Oct 2020 as amended on 01 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
REDHILL AND REIGATE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 12
Nutfield Court
26 Goodworth Road
REDHILL
RH1 1TE
- Phone:
- 01737767757
- Email:
- treasurer@rru3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window