THE MAGIC CIRCLE FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the education of the public in the history and practice of the art of magic
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 September 1987: Standard registration
- CENTRE FOR THE MAGIC ARTS / CMA (Working name)
- CENTRE FOR THE MAGIC ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE MAGIC CIRCLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vimal Tilakapala | Chair | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marvin Roy Berglas | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
STUART ALAN SCOTT | Trustee | 25 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE CAMPBELL | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £201.86k | £146.42k | £187.00k | £165.43k | £182.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £200.18k | £143.56k | £163.19k | £188.82k | £213.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.94k | £34.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 February 2022 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JAN 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 APR 1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND PRACTICE OF THE ART OF MAGIC IN PARTICULAR BY MAINTAINING A LIBRARY AND MUSEUM OF MAGIC WORKS AND ARTEFACTS BY PROMOTING PUBLIC LECTURES AND BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Centre for the Magic Arts
12 Stephenson Way
Kings Cross
London
NW1 2HD
- Phone:
- 020 7387 2222
- Email:
- cma@themagiccircle.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window