BUSINESS IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Business in the Community is the oldest and largest business-led membership organisation dedicated to responsible business. We inspire, engage and challenge members and we mobilise that collective strength as a force for good in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£18,393,929
Donations and legacies | £590.35k | |
Charitable activities | £17.60m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £199.39k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£14,017,380
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £14.02m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £86,211 from 4 government contract(s) and £484,671 from 11 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £14.02m | |
Retained for future use | £4.38m |
People

229 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 13 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- B I T C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Harrison | Chair | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Shiva Bahrololoumi CBE | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Anne Davies | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raman Bhatia | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Charles-Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dame Alison Rose | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HUTTON | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Charles Frederick Weed CBE | Trustee | 17 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Mark Pocklington CB | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.40m | £16.90m | £14.49m | £13.99m | £18.39m | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.95m | £14.82m | £15.59m | £15.84m | £14.02m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £133.95k | £93.45k | £102.76k | £17.35k | £86.21k | |
|
Income from government grants | £657.95k | £486.58k | £683.54k | £644.86k | £484.67k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.30m | £904.83k | £1.03m | £1.06m | £590.35k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.09m | £16.00m | £13.46m | £12.88m | £17.60m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.97k | £771 | £3.81k | £42.91k | £199.39k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £16.95m | £14.82m | £15.59m | £15.84m | £14.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £168.26k | £169.52k | £171.12k | £186.11k | £186.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £21.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £846.43k | £774.17k | £763.32k | £744.25k | £733.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.10m | £8.43m | £7.20m | £4.98m | £8.80m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.03m | £3.64m | £3.50m | £3.11m | £2.54m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 May 2021 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2ND MARCH 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 10TH SEPTEMBER 1987, 8TH DECEMBER 1994 AND 4TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2015
Charitable objects
2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT AND POVERTY BY PROMOTING THE PRACTICAL INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT OF COMPANIES, FIRMS, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, IN ADVANCING INDUSTRY AND COMMERCIAL AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISE BY CREATING OR ASSISTING IN THE CREATION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMPLOYMENT IN AREAS WHERE INVOLUNTARY UNEMPLOYMENT IS CAUSING POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILL HEALTH; 2.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF RELATING TO THE CORPORATE SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT POLICIES AND PRACTICES OF INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE; 2.1.3 OTHERWISE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND FURTHER OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE PRACTICAL INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT OF COMPANIES, FIRMS, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN SUCH PURPOSES PARTICULARLY IN THE COMMUNITIES IN WHICH THEY HAVE OPERATIONAL INTERESTS. 2.1.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE PRACTICAL INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT OF COMPANIES, FIRMS, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN PROTECTING AND PRESERVING THE ENVIRONMENT IN THE COURSE OF THEIR ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUSINESS IN THE COMMUNITY
137 SHEPHERDESS WALK
LONDON
N1 7RQ
- Phone:
- 02075668650
- Email:
- lesley.wolfenden@bitc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window