THE CHASE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All activities are aimed at helping the Chase Community Hospital- primarily to provide:- 1) Medical equipment to departments, clinics and the ward. 2) Extra ameneties within the hospital, as needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 October 1987: Standard registration
- 22 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1064723 THE ROSEMARY FOUNDATION LIMITED
- 22 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1195572 MIDHURST PALLIATIVE CARE CIO
- 22 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1165292 DEMENTIA FRIENDLY HAMPSHIRE
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE CHASE HOSPITAL AND ELIZABETH DIBBEN CLINIC (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.55k | £1.27k | £53 | £4 | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.48k | £1.28k | £8.38k | £2.33k | £892 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD SEPTEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND CLINIC AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF CHASE HOSPITAL AND ELIZABETH DIBBEN CLINIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window