ARMY FLYING MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity number: 297897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A PUBLIC MUSEUM RECORDING AND EXHIBITING ALL ASPECTS OF FLYING IN THE BRITISH ARMY BOTH PRESENT AND PAST.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE MUSEUM OF ARMY FLYING LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Neil David Sexton CB Chair 20 January 2023
None on record
Colonel Edward Butterworth Trustee 05 May 2023
None on record
Colonel Brendan Shaw Trustee 05 May 2023
1ST LAVINGTON SEA SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
URCHFONT VILLAGE CRICKET CLUB
Received: On time
Andrew Richard Bulpitt Trustee 15 July 2022
None on record
James Johnson Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
David Stephen Short Trustee 21 January 2022
None on record
PAUL ELI BEAVER Trustee 26 July 2019
NATIONAL SPITFIRE PROJECT
Received: 25 days late
Colonel Retired Paul Edwards MBE Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Rhonda Smith Trustee 17 May 2019
None on record
Caroline Mary Hopkins Trustee 26 July 2017
None on record
Brigadier Colin Sibun Trustee 31 July 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £1.35m £747.85k £985.96k £812.47k £979.65k
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.00m £1.20m £1.12m £1.18m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £173.12k £281.62k £179.61k £152.02k £136.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £634.87k £531.58k £414.77k £167.89k £169.10k
Income - Other trading activities £291.01k £92.73k £197.38k £250.74k £265.55k
Income - Charitable activities £351.62k £120.38k £349.40k £391.91k £533.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.45k £432 £402 £1.17k £4.83k
Income - Other £69.47k £2.74k £24.00k £756 £6.77k
Income - Legacies £3.00k £98.55k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.01m £851.86k £960.93k £810.46k £863.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds £10.43k £5.39k £57.01k £63.34k £58.03k
Expenditure - Governance £25.75k £25.97k £26.66k £35.25k £41.09k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £271.21k £143.34k £186.91k £249.61k £256.96k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Own use assets £2.59m £2.36m £2.16m £1.91m £1.66m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £790.31k £642.72k £445.95k £386.05k £448.54k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £340.09k £217.29k £43.60k £40.93k £51.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 05 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ARMY FLYING MUSEUM LTD
MIDDLE WALLOP
STOCKBRIDGE
HANTS
SO20 8FB
Phone:
01264781086