THE T E LAWRENCE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The society publishes a bi-annual journal and three newsletters per year. We hold a two day symposium every two years and stage visits and talks throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin James Winter | Chair | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nynke Fleur Harvelt | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ernest Gardiner | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Henry Thompson II | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Victoria Coates | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Keith Sleep | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Johnson-Allen | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Heritage | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Joseph Alexander Berton | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Neale | Trustee | 23 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Pieter John Cecil Shipster | Trustee | 26 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
Carol Darbyshire | Trustee | 24 September 2003 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Purver | Trustee | 24 September 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.67k | £23.53k | £23.88k | £49.92k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.16k | £4.72k | £39.13k | £63.76k | £22.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 June 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 June 2024 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/09/1987 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2011 as amended on 25 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE LIFE AND WORKS OF T E LAWRENCE AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH (AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF) INTO HIS LIFE AND WORKS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
T E Lawrence Society
P O Box 728
Oxford
OX2 9ZJ
- Phone:
- 07780223221
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window