THE LORD FORTE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to encourage excellence within the fields of hospitality, encompassing the hotel, catering, travel and tourism industries within the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ROCCO FORTE | Chair | 17 November 1987 |
|
|||||
Geoff Booth | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MCKENZIE | Trustee | 06 July 2010 |
|
|
||||
MR NICK SCADE MBE | Trustee | 01 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
THE HON OLGA MARIE LOUISE ANNA POLIZZI DI SORRENTINO CBE | Trustee | 17 November 1987 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.49k | £69.60k | £76.47k | £81.77k | £82.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.72k | £47.15k | £89.79k | £117.64k | £87.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 February 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17TH NOVEMBER 1987
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT WITHOUT DEROGATING FROM THE GENERAL DISCRETION AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR SELECTION OF PARTICULAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES PAY SPECIAL REGARD TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ANY CHARITABLE FIELD OF LEARNING BUT ESPECIALLY IN THE FIELDS OF HOTEL MANAGEMENT AND CATERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROCCO FORTE HOTELS LIMITED
78 ST JAMES'S STREET
LONDON
SW1A 1JB
- Phone:
- 02073212626
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window