WOODGREEN PETS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Taking in unwanted and lost animals, providing shelter and care, finding secure and loving homes and providing help,support and guidance for pet owners. Teaching the public, young and old, about their responsibilities towards animals in society and promoting responsible animal welfare measures to central and local government.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£18,372,000
Donations and legacies | £12.84m | |
Charitable activities | £281.00k | |
Other trading activities | £4.80m | |
Investments | £395.00k | |
Other | £59.00k |
Total expenditure:
£20,893,000
Raising funds | £10.92m | |
Charitable activities | £9.97m | |
Other | £0 |
£524,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £56,888 from 4 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.92m | |
Charitable expenditure | £9.97m |
People

338 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
769 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- Woodgreen Pets Charity (Working name)
- WOOD GREEN ANIMAL SHELTERS (Previous name)
- WOOD GREEN, THE ANIMALS CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Michael Mrs | Chair | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Woodhouse | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sacha Benfredj | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Ignarski | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caleb Rockstone | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS P L GEE | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jaggers | Trustee | 07 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.02m | £12.85m | £17.07m | £20.76m | £18.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.77m | £15.43m | £18.13m | £20.19m | £20.89m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £48.27k | £45.94k | £64.38k | £54.10k | £56.89k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.21m | £83.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.79m | £9.70m | £13.12m | £15.15m | £12.84m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.77m | £2.59m | £3.45m | £4.04m | £4.80m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £301.00k | £161.24k | £197.68k | £233.00k | £281.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £629.00k | £398.60k | £302.57k | £328.00k | £395.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £531.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.01m | £59.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £7.18m | £4.55m | £7.35m | £8.90m | £6.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.44m | £6.97m | £7.11m | £8.86m | £9.97m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.61m | £8.46m | £11.01m | £11.30m | £10.92m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.00k | £19.25k | £19.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £90.00k | £80.13k | £74.06k | £62.00k | £66.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.72m | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.87m | £6.04m | £8.23m | £7.62m | £7.12m | |
|
Long-term investments | £18.71m | £13.21m | £13.53m | £12.65m | £12.45m | |
|
Other assets | £2.40m | £5.97m | £3.15m | £5.35m | £3.77m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £772.00k | £1.04m | £1.63m | £2.20m | £1.92m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 NOV 1986 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 JAN 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 NOV 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 NOV 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 OCT 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 OCT 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 JUL 2023
Charitable objects
THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PETS THROUGH CARE AND RE-HOMING; (2) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AS TO RESPONSIBLE OWNERSHIP AND CARE OF PETS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THESE OBJECTS ‘PETS’ ARE DOMESTICATED OR DOMESTIC-BRED ANIMALS WHOSE PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, BEHAVIOURAL AND SOCIAL NEEDS CAN BE READILY MET AS COMPANIONS IN THE HOME, OR IN CLOSE DAILY RELATIONSHIPS WITH HUMANS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wood Green Animal Shelters
London Road
Godmanchester
Huntingdon
Cambridgeshire
PE29 2NH
- Phone:
- 03003039333
- Email:
- info@woodgreen.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window