Financial history THE WESTERN FRONT ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 298365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £378.36k £415.36k £492.39k £480.58k £404.01k
Total expenditure £240.33k £223.28k £358.01k £426.68k £405.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A