MANCHESTER COLLEGE OXFORD CHAPEL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Unitarian congregation meeting in-person in Harris Manchester College, Oxford chapel and online for weekly worship. We also run social/cultural activities, small groups for spiritual reflection, interfaith projects, a social justice group with community outreach and offer members pastoral support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 February 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Ellen Sinnamon | Chair | 20 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Kay Angela Wardle | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Charles Whitehouse | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Ruth Alison Baer | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £13.45k | £18.60k | £19.36k | £26.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.03k | £9.22k | £9.69k | £10.71k | £11.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 December 2021 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST JANUARY 1988 AS AMENDED 27 MARCH 1994 AS AMENDED 23 NOV 97 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2004 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 26 NOV 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARRIS MANCHESTER COLLEGE
MANSFIELD ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 3TD
- Phone:
- 01865 302909
- Email:
- oxfordunitarians@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window