THE SUE THOMSON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant-making; the principal beneficiary is Christ's Hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSANNAH HOLLIMAN | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Monsen PhD | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mr Mike Barford | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN DUNCAN OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TIM BINNINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £220.61k | £293.77k | £193.15k | £232.46k | £232.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £154.70k | £180.78k | £264.83k | £180.95k | £219.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DEED DATED 17TH FEBRUARY 1988 AND DEED OF AMENDMENT 29TH NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES ARE REQUIRED TO HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OR CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THEY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
76C Reigate Hill
REIGATE
Surrey
RH2 9PD
- Phone:
- 07508038632
- Email:
- stfsusannah@aol.com
- Website:
-
none.nowebsite
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window