KING'S LYNN CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to preserve the quality of the local built environment through participation in the planning process. We are a statutory body for consultation. The society has a wide membership (approx 300) to whom we offer a lecture programme and regular newsletters. We aim to make the town a pleasant place to live and work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 23 March 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON GIFFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Anthony John Wright | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Stanley Fayers | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
KIM DAVID LEONARD | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Sandra Coleman | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gunn | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MORRISH | Trustee | 24 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARY JAMES | Trustee |
|
||||||
HELEN RUSSELL-JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.74k | £2.83k | £7.01k | £6.20k | £18.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.11k | £3.10k | £5.81k | £7.77k | £15.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/04/1987 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2011
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF THE FORMER BOROUGH OF KINGS LYNN AND THE CIVIL PARISHES OF NORTH WOOTTON AND SOUTH WOOTTON (II) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (III) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATIONPROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Queen Street
KING'S LYNN
PE30 1HT
- Phone:
- 01553763983
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window