BRITISH FRIENDS OF RAMOTH JERUSALEM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes Relief of Poverty - Overseas Aid - Advancement of religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 12 April 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RABBI D HALPERN | Chair |
|
||||||||||
ROSE SARAH HALPERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOSEPH GUTSTEIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.49k | £64.10k | £68.51k | £81.97k | £80.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.34k | £49.29k | £60.63k | £102.14k | £71.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH FEBRUARY 1988
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 THE APPROACH
LONDON
NW4 2HU
- Phone:
- 02082025499
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window