RYE AND DISTRICT UNIT 466 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Aim of the Sea Cadet Corps is to help young people towards responsible adulthood by encouraging valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct, using a nautical theme based on the customs of the Royal Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 18 April 1988: Standard registration
- RYE SCC (Working name)
- T.S. RYE (Working name)
- SEA CADET CORPS - RYE AND DISTRICT UNIT NO 466 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James David Sheppard | Chair | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul John White LL.M. M.A | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Wendy Margaret Little | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Anthony Burke | Trustee | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PO SCC Philip John Whiteman | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CANON RICHARD ORCHARD | Trustee | 09 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SHANE REDMOND OBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL WHITEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.51k | £26.67k | £16.82k | £6.59k | £28.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.09k | £11.06k | £18.61k | £10.09k | £30.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.91k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 THE MARTLETS
BROAD OAK
RYE
TN31 6DN
- Phone:
- 01424882675
- Email:
- ryeseacadets@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window