HONITON AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activity of the Charity is the holding of an annual agricultural show in Honiton, to promote agriculture, and other trades, crafts and professions associated with it. There are farm competitions during the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

28 Trustee(s)
135 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 June 1988: Standard registration
- HONITON SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
28 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben MOORE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Steven Talling | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Sally Ann Maynard | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hammett | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Cedric Dare | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Hawkins | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Woods | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derek White | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sam Tuke | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Larcombe-Ford | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Underdown | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kallaway | Trustee | 01 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
Harry Durrant | Trustee | 01 January 2006 |
|
|
||||
Charles Hopcraft | Trustee | 18 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
Richard Marker | Trustee | 22 March 1991 |
|
|
||||
Richard Coley | Trustee | 22 March 1991 |
|
|||||
Sir John Michael Kennaway | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID E PARISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
F D ARSCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
C B TUKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
D B SNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Henry DERRYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Andrew LUXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
E R UNDERDOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
R H DERRYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
F E MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
C A LEWIS-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
P F J FORCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £299.50k | £44.70k | £267.03k | £278.65k | £299.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £281.35k | £83.96k | £251.92k | £255.44k | £269.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 25 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH JANURARY 1986
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE AGRICULTURE AND TO SUCH END GENERALLY TO IMPROVE AGRICULTURE IN ALL ITS BRANCHES AND TO ENCOURAGE SKILL AND INDUSTRY IN AGRICULTURE AND IN ALL TRADES, CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTURE, AND TO PROMOTE THE BREEDING OF HORSES, CATTLE AND OTHER ANIMALS. 2. TO PROMOTE INDUSTRY IN GENERAL. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bank House
66a High Street
Honiton
Devon
EX14 1PS
- Phone:
- 0140446114
- Email:
- marcelle@honitonshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window