Financial history LORAINE TRUST

Charity number: 299570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.17k £7.79k £5.60k £5.51k £7.90k
Total expenditure £8.00k £2.60k £1.68k £9.92k £9.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A