LORAINE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty by the improvement of methods and practice of horticulture of small holdings anywhere in the world where there is a need to maintain adequate production for those trying to live of the land
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Kirbye Schmidt | Chair | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Loraine Schmidt | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Farmer | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Usher | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GORDON SHUTE HARRIS | Trustee | 15 July 1987 |
|
|||||
Patricia Anne WOLSELEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.17k | £7.79k | £5.60k | £5.51k | £7.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.00k | £2.60k | £1.68k | £9.92k | £9.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 15TH JULY 1987
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF METHODS AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE OF SMALL-HOLDINGS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD WHERE THERE IS A NEED TO MAINTAIN ADEQUATE PRODUCTION FOR THOSE TRYING TO LIVE OFF LAND AND WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ORGANIC USE OF THE LAND AND METHODS IN KEEPING BOTH WITH NATURE AND WITH SOIL CONSERVATION AND WITH LOCAL SELF-SUFFICIENCY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greencombe
Porlock Weir Road
Porlock
MINEHEAD
Somerset
TA24 8NU
- Phone:
- 01643-862363
- Email:
- info@lorainetrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window