ABINGDON DIVISION GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abingdon Division Guides assists, trains and supports leaders who are running Rainbow, Brownie, Guide and Ranger units.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 23 June 1964: Standard registration
- 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
- ABINGDON DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- ABINGDON DIVISION GIRL GUIDES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harriet Elvins | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tania Nurton | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Lees | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARY THOMPSON | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £922 | £260 | £416 | £320 | £278 | |
|
Total expenditure | £532 | £532 | £491 | £559 | £441 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 27/7/67 UPON TRUSTS GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938.
Charitable objects
ABINGDON DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES LOCAL ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ABINGDON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Whitehorns Farm Road
Charlton
WANTAGE
OX12 7HH
- Phone:
- 07545868429
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window