ROCHE VICTORY HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 16 July 1962: Standard registration
- ROCHE VICTORY HALL MANAGING TRUSTEES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE ANN WEBSTER | Chair | 03 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BATTISON | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
CLAUDIA LOUISE EDYVEAN | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HAWKEY | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CLUTSOM | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Burdon | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vivian Blake | Trustee | 02 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Edyvean | Trustee | 27 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Terry Tabb | Trustee | 27 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Brian Higman | Trustee | 27 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Irene Northey | Trustee | 27 September 2010 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Inch | Trustee | 27 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | 01/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.02k | £2.38k | £3.94k | £1.49k | £4.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.89k | £330 | £600 | £4.67k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13TH APRIL 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ROCHE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROCHE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Tregarrick Road
Roche
St. Austell
PL26 8EL
- Phone:
- 01726891188
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window