1ST WOLVERTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Group provides training for it's young members in accordance with the procedures of the Scout Association

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £28,429
Total expenditure: £24,406

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • 1ST WOLVERTON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RODNEY LESLIE LESTER Chair
None on record
Natasha Patel Trustee 27 June 2024
None on record
Beverley Anne Delaney Trustee 27 June 2024
THE JEAN POTTER FUND
Received: On time
MILTON KEYNES DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Paul Scoins Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Emma Naylor Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Kim Louise Sayer Trustee 15 September 2023
None on record
Katrina Witham Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
IAN BODEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.37k £22.56k £27.88k £21.88k £28.43k
Total expenditure £18.70k £10.83k £44.42k £20.64k £24.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 01 May 2024 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
24 Hendrix Drive
Crownhill
MILTON KEYNES
MK8 0EH
Phone:
0000000000