Accounts and annual returns STENEK HA'N MOR DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 300729
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 May 2025 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 May 2025 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2025 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 February 2025 392 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2022 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 March 2022 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 March 2022 401 days late Download Open in new window