Financial history STENEK HA'N MOR DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 300729
Charity reporting is up to date (105 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.00k £14.26k £17.90k £30.65k £27.41k
Total expenditure £66.68k £12.83k £21.54k £26.79k £25.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A