Financial history NEWTON ABBOT CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £65.05k £87.38k £105.26k £118.06k £136.53k
Total expenditure £73.34k £95.58k £102.08k £107.50k £137.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.00k £27.19k £6.76k N/A £1.30k