GLOBE AND LAUREL MAGAZINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to maintain and promote contact between past and present members of the Corps, fostering mutual friendship between them. It also fosters 'esprit de corps', comradeship and the welfare of the Corps by preserving its traditions. It makes donations to those armed forces charities that benefit Royal Marines.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 November 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Daniel Jukes | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Gary Edward Green OBE | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Neil Sutherland MBE ADC | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Ollive | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.02k | £150.33k | £142.26k | £151.71k | £159.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.84k | £111.60k | £190.88k | £159.82k | £140.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1997, AMENDED BY DEED 25 AUGUST 2004. as amended on 03 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL MARINES CORPS (HEREAFTER KNOWN AS THE "CORPS") BY: A) MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING CONTACT BETWEEN PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE CORPS, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP AND THE WELFARE OF THE CORPS AND PRESERVING ITS TRADITIONS, AND 2) TO MAKE DONATIONS TO THOSE ARMED FORCES CHARITIES WHICH BENEFIT ROYAL MARINES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
H M S Excellent
Whale Island
Portsmouth
PO2 8ER
- Phone:
- 02392547209
- Email:
- bpm@royalsmag.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window