Financial history REDBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301586
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £18.44k £22.61k £12.19k £9.02k £8.50k
Total expenditure £11.03k £6.76k £10.31k £8.92k £37.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.60k £4.47k N/A N/A