ISLE OF WIGHT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IW Scout Council provides advice, guidance, information and training to the Scout Groups on the Isle of Wight, to enable them to undertake a varied programme of activities for our young people in line with the principles and objectives of the Scouting movement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,590 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
395 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- 31 March 2020: Funds received from 1080309 EAST WIGHT DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
- ISLE OF WIGHT SCOUT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Hollebon | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Maya Ciclo Masi | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Joshua Dowsett | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John William Earley | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Reeves | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Grist | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Simpson | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Michael Fallick | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|||||
David Graham Salter | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.28k | £94.25k | £85.05k | £195.32k | £217.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.46k | £110.30k | £50.50k | £164.54k | £178.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.57k | £6.41k | £1.59k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 December 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Corf Scout Camping Site
Corf Road
Shalfleet
NEWPORT
PO30 4NT
- Phone:
- 07544555839
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window