Financial history HITCHIN YOUTH TRUST

Charity Number: 302398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £201.37k £101.52k £55.27k £113.42k £266.30k
Total expenditure £172.41k £144.40k £245.26k £189.75k £228.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A