Financial history MUCH HADHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 302431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.29k £18.07k £27.94k £21.61k £21.57k
Total expenditure £25.81k £13.57k £15.59k £23.65k £23.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.36k £960
Income from government grants N/A £12.14k £19.32k £3.23k N/A