Financial history MANDEVILLE HALL

Charity number: 302646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £23.13k £35.03k £30.21k £38.61k £32.12k
Total expenditure £20.46k £13.79k £24.08k £28.03k £33.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.33k £17.37k £2.67k N/A N/A