Financial history TY GWYN HOLIDAY PLAY SCHEME

Charity number: 1063920
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 17/06/2021 17/06/2022 17/06/2023 17/06/2024
Total gross income £5.10k £12.08k £144.63k £139.20k £152.75k
Total expenditure £0 £10.52k £86.76k £101.11k £142.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £37.30k N/A N/A