CYMDEITHAS EDWARD LLWYD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GWEITHGAREDDAU NATURIAETHOL A HANESYDDOL GYDOL Y FLWYDDYN DRWY GYMRU. TREFNU CYNHADLEDDAU NATURIAETHOL AC AMGYLCHEDDOL. STONDIN YN YR EISTEDDFOD GENEDLAETHOL. CYNNAL GWEFAN Y GYMDEITHAS A GWEFAN LLEN NATUR (WWW.LLENNATUR.CYMRU). TRAWSGRIFIO A DADANSODDI HEN DDYDDIADURON I WEFAN LLEN NATUR. BATHU RHESTR O ENWAU CYMRAEG AR FFYNGAU I'W CYHOEDDI. CYHOEDDI DAU GYLCHGRAWN, Y NATURIAETHWR A LLEN NATUR
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

22 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 23 September 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IONA EVANS | Chair | 17 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dilys Elen Owen BA | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Eurgain Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Shelagh Fishlock | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Skull | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rhisiart ap Gwilym | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dominig Kervegant | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Haf Meredydd | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Gwyn Roberts | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DR GORONWY WYNNE | Trustee | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAFYDD VAUGHAN LEWIS | Trustee | 15 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
John Griffith | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Jackie Willmington | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Gareth Wyn Jones | Trustee | 19 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr HYWEL MADOG JONES | Trustee | 27 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET ELIZABETH ROBERTS | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN ROY WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DUNCAN JEFFREY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
TWM ELIAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
IWAN RHYS ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EIRIAN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.20k | £14.87k | £19.34k | £32.74k | £26.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.64k | £9.95k | £21.95k | £33.91k | £31.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2013
Charitable objects
HYRWYDDO ADDYSG ER BUDD Y CYHOEDD DRWY: (A) ASTUDIAETH O BLANHIGION, ANIFEILIAID, A THIRFFURFIAU CYMRU, A'R BERTHYNAS RHYNGDDYNT (B) YMWYBYDDIAETH O AMGYLCHEDD A THREFTADAETH NATURIOL CYMRU, A GWEITHIO DROS EI GWARCHOD (C) ASTUDIAETH O YRFA EDWARD LLWYD A'I DDYSG YM MEUSYDD BOTANEG, DAEAREG, ARCHEOLEG A HANES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Birkdale
Warmley
BRISTOL
BS30 8GH
- Phone:
- 07341 623175
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window